CA SB2 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 52.1 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 1029 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 832.7, 13503, 13506, 13510, 13510.1, and 13512 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 13510) of Chapter 1 of Title 4 of Part 4 of, and to add Sections 13509.5, 13509.6, 13510.8, 13510.85, and 13510.9 to, the Penal Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers: certification: civil rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB2 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Assembly - SB 2 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Akilah Weber (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Bradford et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2021-09-08SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 18.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-01AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-28AssemblyJune 29 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-28AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2021-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2021-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 935.) (April 27).
2021-04-15Senate(Corrected April 28).
2021-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 13.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code52.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code1029Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13503Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13506Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13509.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13509.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13510Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13510.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13510.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13510.85New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13510.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13512Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback