CA SB194 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 185 of, and to add Section 626.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to crime.
Title
Crime: masks and disguises.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2019-03-26 | Senate | March 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 440.) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 626.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |