CA SB1572 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-31 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-31 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 16428.81 and 16428.82 to the Government Code, relating to greenhouse gases, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: AB 32
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1572 Pavley Senate Third Reading By SKINNER Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1572 Pavley (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1572 Pavley Senate Third Reading By SKINNER Amend By SKINNER Set #1 (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1572 Pavley (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) | |
2012-08-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 29). | |
2012-08-28 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6404.) | |
2012-08-27 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6265.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-06-15 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-05-31 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3746.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3599.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-22 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-21 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-11 | Set for hearing May 21. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3262.) (April 23). | |
2012-04-11 | Set for hearing April 23. | |
2012-04-09 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 16. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16428.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16428.82 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16428.83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16440 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38575 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38575.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38575.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |