CA SB148 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 359.5, 8141.5, 8142, 8150, 9083.5, and 15452 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Primary elections: voter-nominated offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 14311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 15452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 359.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8141.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8142 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9083.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |