CA SB1451 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11785 of the Insurance Code, relating to the State Compensation Insurance Fund.
Title
State Compensation Insurance Fund: executive and management appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1451 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1451 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1451 Mendoza (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1451 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1451 Mendoza (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-24 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-24 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5887.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 3808.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3560.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11785 | Amended Code | Citation Text |