CA SB1409 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Franchise Tax Board: California earned income tax credit: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1409 Caballero Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1409 Caballero Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1409 Caballero (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5219.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-11AssemblyAugust 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-07-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 27).
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2020-06-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3884.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-22SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time and amended.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3772.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3576.) (May 21).
2020-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 21.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback