CA SB14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2015 - 75% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1708.5.5 to the Civil Code, and to amend Section 1106 of the Evidence Code, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual battery: consent defense: minor's sexual conduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - SB 14 Lara Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate 3rd Reading SB14 Lara (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-07-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16).
2015-05-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2015-04-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-04-16SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 632.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-04-14SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 7).
2015-03-25SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2015-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2014-12-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1708.5.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Evidence Code1106Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_14&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20150316_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20150414_amended_sen_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20150407_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20150416_0938AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20150616_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20150706_0104PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback