CA SB1399 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 277, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 277, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 52323, 52324, and 52325 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Agricultural seed: county seed enforcement subventions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1399 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1399 Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1399 Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 277, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3329.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3018.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 52323 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 52324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 52325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |