CA SB1394 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11292, 11293, and 11294 of, to repeal Section 11206 of, and to add Sections 11293.5 and 11295 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Private railroad car tax: valuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3518.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11206 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11292 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11293 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11293.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11294 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11295 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6736 | Amended Code | Citation Text |