CA SB1393 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1013, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1013, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 667 and 1385 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1393 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1393 Mitchell et al (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1393 Mitchell et al (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1013, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 15). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5037.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667 | Amended Code | Citation Text |