CA SB1393 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 667 and 1385 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1393 Mitchell et al (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-14SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-09SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1385Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code667Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback