CA SB1340 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 73 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: active solar energy systems: extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1340 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1340 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1340 Hertzberg (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1340 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1340 Hertzberg (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 425, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5008.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 5950.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 6 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(c)). |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 30). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3966.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3793.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3609.) (May 4). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |