CA SB1333 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5008.9 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state beaches and parks.
Title
State beaches and parks: smoking ban.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1333 Block Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1333 Block Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1333 Block Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1333 Block (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1333 Block Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1333 Block Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1333 Block (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5507.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6272.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5974.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4053.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4008.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3496.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5008.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |