CA SB1332 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 17060, 26600, 27050, 27600, 28300, and 31705 of, and to add Section 27882 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1332 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1332 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1332 Mendoza Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1332 Mendoza (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1332 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1332 Mendoza Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1332 Mendoza (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-26 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5409.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5965.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4128.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4008.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3395.) (April 5). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11106.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 17060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27880 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27881 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27882 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 28300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 31705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |