CA SB1330 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 544, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 544, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14215 of the Penal Code, relating to missing persons.
Title
Missing persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1330 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1330 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1330 Galgiani Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1330 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1330 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1330 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1330 Galgiani Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1330 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1330 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 544, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5490.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6242.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5975.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5488.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3712.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3614.) (April 19). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 12300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8594.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |