CA SB1316 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5090.42 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parks and recreation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Off-highway vehicular recreation: Carnegie State Vehicular Recreation Area: Alameda-Tesla Expansion Area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1316 Glazer et al (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 6.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and A. & A.R.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4396.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4308.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 4785.) (April 24).
2018-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4699.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and G.O.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5090.42New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback