CA SB1314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 16.7 (commencing with Section 26450) to the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Community Energy Resilience Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-04-06 | Senate | April 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 26450 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1314 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1314 |