CA SB1307 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1245.210 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 11005, 11005.2, 11011.13, 13332.11, 13332.12, 15853, and 15855 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 10106 and 10107 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Section 408 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to high-speed rail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-Speed Rail Authority: property acquisition: capital outlays: public contracts: county assessor’s records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback