CA SB1306 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on AGRI. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on AGRI. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12978.8 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pesticides.
Title
Pesticides: bromadiolone: internet purchasing and selling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on AGRI. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and AGRI. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 12978.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1306 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1306 |