CA SB1304 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 90.2 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Veterans: transitional assistance program: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1304 Roth Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1304 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 Newman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1304 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1304 Newman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6312.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4212.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4790.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 90.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |