CA SB1301 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 368, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 368, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 2.6 (commencing with Section 71107) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Tijuana River Valley: watershed action plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1301 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1301 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1301 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1301 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Gloria (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1301 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 368, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 5226.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3881.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3771.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71107 | New Code | See Bill Text |