CA SB1301 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 694, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 694, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 107, 158, 171.08, 911, 1100, 1112.5, 1113, 1151, 1152, 1155, 1201, 2500, 2501, 2502, 2502.01, 2502.03, 2502.04, 2502.05, 2502.06, 2503.1, 2504, 2506, 2507, 2509, 2510, 2510.1, 2511, 2512, 2513, 2514, 2515, 2516, 2517, 2600, 2600.5, 2601, 2602, 2603, 2604, 2605, 2700, 2701, 2702, 2800, 2900, 3000, 3001, 3002, 3100, 3200, 3201, 3202, 3203, 3300, 3301, 3302, 3303, 3304, 3305, 3400, 3401, 3500, 3501, 3502, 3503, 5813.5, 7813.5, 9621, and 12504 of, to amend the heading of Division 1.5 (commencing with Section 2500) of Title 1 of, and to add Section 3307 to, the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Corporate Flexibility Act of 2011: Social Purpose
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1301 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1301 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1301 DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1301 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By ACHADJIAN (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1301 DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 694, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 6120.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6016.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 9). |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3320.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3161.) (April 9). |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |