CA SB130 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 987.005 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: mental health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | April 28 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 987.005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5600.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |