CA SB1277 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 600.6, 600.7, and 600.8 to the Penal Code, relating to animal abuse.
Title
Animal abuse: registry: Internet publication.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Florez [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-10 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3309.) | |
2010-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-11 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |