CA SB1266 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4532 of, and to add Section 1170.05 to, the Penal Code, relating to inmates.
Title
Inmates: alternative custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Asm. Bonnie Lowenthal [D] | Sen. Gloria McLeod [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Asm. Lori Saldana [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1266 Liu (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1266 Liu Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1266 Liu Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL Amend By LOWENTHAL Set #1 (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1266 Liu (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1266 Liu Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1266 Liu Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL Amend By LOWENTHAL Set #1 (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1266 Liu (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2010-08-30 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5008.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-26 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 28. Page 6758.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6352.) | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 44. Noes 25. Page 6328.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-08-03 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2010-06-03 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-05-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 6. Page 3656.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-19 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 3547.) | |
2010-05-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-04-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3165.) | |
2010-03-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-17 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |