CA SB1258 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 8587.3 and 8587.4 to the Government Code, and to add Section 16031 to the Insurance Code, relating to emergency services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergency services: property insurance surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Banking, Finance and Insurance (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Banking, Finance and Insurance (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-03 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-23 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3292.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-15 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3181.) Re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2010-03-12 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-03-04 | To Coms. on G.O. and B., F. & I. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |