CA SB1239 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19318 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to inedible kitchen grease.
Title
Inedible kitchen grease: biofuels: transporter exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 19318 | New Code | See Bill Text |