CA SB1238 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42704.5 of, and to add Section 42704.3 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Department of Transportation: highways and roads: recycled plastics study and specifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1238 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3879.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Hueso. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3770.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 29. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42704.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42704.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |