CA SB1194 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 853, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 53.5 to the Civil Code, relating to privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privacy: lodging and common carriers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1194 Lara Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1194 Lara Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 56 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1194 Lara (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 853, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5935.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 6702.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3).
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 19).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4423.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4305.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4915.) (May 1).
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code53.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback