CA SB1179 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1633.3 of the Civil Code, relating to electronic transactions.
Title
Electronic transactions: insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Assembly - SB 1179 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1179 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1179 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5305.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3476.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3326.) (April 5). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1633.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |