CA SB1166 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3118.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3118.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 39800 and 39820 of, and to add Section 41857 to, the Education Code, relating to education finance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Education finance: home-to-school transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3118.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 39800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 39820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41857 | New Code | See Bill Text |