CA SB1143 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3208.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3208.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 3700) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to public employee benefits.
Title
Public employees' benefits: postemployment benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 3208.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-04-13 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3700 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 7507.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |