CA SB1137 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 523 of the Penal Code, relating to computer crimes.
Title
Computer crimes: ransomware.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1137 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1137 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1137 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By INS. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1137 Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1137 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1137 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By INS. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1137 Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 725, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5404.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6084.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5958.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4044.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4004.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3522.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |