CA SB1130 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17508 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to false advertising.
Title
False advertising: substantiation of claims: county counsel.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - SB 1130 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 Wieckowski (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 Wieckowski (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5401.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8). |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 3429.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3336.) (March 29). |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 17508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |