CA SB1130 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 25987.1) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Energy: energy assessment: nonresidential buildings:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 De León (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 De León (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2). | |
2012-06-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-06-18 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-06-04 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-05-21 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3553.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-05-08 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-07 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3303.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-19 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-04-18 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-04-11 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25499 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25987.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 26200 | New Code | See Bill Text |