CA SB1130 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2807 of the Penal Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Corrections: Prison Industry Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 Aanestad (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Set, final hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1130 Aanestad (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Set, final hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Do pass. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) | |
2010-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 3722.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-26 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3594.) | |
2010-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. (For vote only.) | |
2010-05-17 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 4. Page 3547.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-05-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-05-06 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-27 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-23 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-22 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3180.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-09 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |