CA SB1102 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 142.2 of, and to add and repeal Section 142.5 of, the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.
Title
Occupational safety and health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 142.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 142.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |