CA SB1084 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-13 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to poverty.
Title
California Economic Security Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Mary Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1084 Liu (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1084 Liu (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.) | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2010-06-10 | To Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and HUM. S. | |
2010-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3734.) To Assembly. | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3671.) | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-05-04 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-28 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-19 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-23 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 2986.) | |
2010-03-09 | Set for hearing March 22. | |
2010-02-25 | To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS. | |
2010-02-18 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |