CA SB108 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2024 by amending Items 0110-001-0001, 0120-011-0001, 0250-496, 0509-001-0001, 0509-495, 0511-001-0001, 0515-495, 0515-496, 0521-101-3228, 0521-131-0001, 0530-001-0001, 0540-001-0001, 0540-101-0001, 0540-495, 0552-001-0001, 0555-495, 0650-001-0001, 0650-001-0140, 0650-001-0890, 0650-001-3228, 0650-001-9740, 0650-101-0890, 0650-101-3228, 0650-490, 0650-495, 0690-103-0001, 0690-496, 0820-001-0001, 0820-001-0367, 0820-001-0567, 0820-015-0001, 0840-495, 0860-002-0001, 0890-001-0890, 0890-101-0890, 2240-001-0001, 2240-001-3144, 2240-121-0001, 2240-495, 2240-496, 2660-108-0042, 2667-001-0046, 2720-496, 2740-496, 3100-001-0001, 3100-490, 3125-001-0568, 3125-101-0286, 3360-001-0890, 3360-001-3117, 3360-001-3228, 3360-101-0890, 3360-101-3117, 3360-101-3228, 3360-491, 3360-003-0890, 3360-103-0890, 3360-496, 3480-001-3046, 3480-002-3046, 3540-001-0001, 3540-301-0001, 3540-492, 3540-496, 3600-001-0001, 3600-490, 3600-495, 3600-497, 3640-101-3228, 3760-490, 3760-495, 3790-001-6029, 3790-002-6029, 3790-101-0001, 3790-301-6029, 3790-490, 3790-491, 3790-495, 3825-490, 3830-490, 3860-001-0001, 3860-001-6083, 3860-101-3228, 3860-301-3228, 3860-301-6088, 3860-495, 3860-496, 3900-011-0115, 3900-491, 3900-495, 3940-001-0193, 3940-001-0306, 3940-001-3058, 3940-102-3228, 3940-490, 3940-497, 3960-001-0014, 3970-001-0133, 3980-001-0001, 3980-001-0044, 4140-101-0001, 4140-495, 4150-001-0933, 4170-001-0289, 4170-101-0001, 4170-102-0942, 4170-495, 4260-001-0001, 4260-001-0890, 4260-001-3428, 4260-101-0001, 4260-101-0890, 4260-101-3428, 4260-101-3431, 4260-116-3397, 4260-118-3428, 4260-495, 4265-001-0001, 4265-111-0001, 4265-495, 4300-001-0001, 4300-101-0001, 4300-495, 4800-101-3381, 5160-001-0001, 5175-101-0001, 5175-101-0890, 5175-495, 5180-001-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-101-0890, 5180-111-0001, 5180-141-0001, 5180-141-0890, 5180-151-0001, 5180-151-0890, 5180-490, 5180-492, 5180-495, 5225-001-0001, 5225-002-0001, 5225-008-0001, 5225-009-0001, 5225-101-0001, 5225-497, 5227-122-0001, 6100-113-0890, 6100-135-0890, 6100-161-0890, 6100-220-0001, 6100-488, 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6610-002-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6870-488, 6980-101-0001, 7100-001-0185, 7100-101-0001, 7120-101-0001, 7120-102-0001, 7350-101-3078, 7502-001-0001, 7600-001-3065, 7730-001-0001, 7760-311-3292, 7900-015-0830, 7900-015-0833, 7900-015-0849, 7900-015-0884, 8260-001-0001, 8260-101-0001, 8570-001-6088, 8570-101-0001, 8570-490, 8570-495, and 8855-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of, by adding Items 0509-101-0001, 0555-491, 0559-002-0001, 0650-101-0001, 0680-001-0001, 0680-001-0890, 0680-001-3228, 0680-101-0001, 0680-101-0890, 0680-102-0001, 0690-005-0001, 0690-007-0001, 0690-102-0001, 0690-105-0001, 0840-490, 2240-106-0001, 2240-107-0001, 2240-108-0001, 2660-101-0001, 2660-301-0001, 3125-491, 3360-002-0890, 3360-004-0890, 3360-005-0890, 3360-006-0890, 3360-102-0890, 3360-104-0890, 3360-105-0890, 3540-003-3228, 3540-004-0001, 3540-494, 3560-490, 3640-101-0001, 3640-103-0001, 3640-495, 3760-101-0001, 3760-102-3228, 3790-003-0392, 3790-012-0001, 3860-014-0001, 3860-101-0001, 3900-102-3228, 3940-106-0001, 3960-492, 3970-492, 4140-490, 4260-112-1019, 4265-001-3385, 4265-012-3080, 4265-111-3385, 5225-491, 5225-492, 6100-222-0001, 6120-217-0001, 6360-490, 8885-492, and 9889-011-0001 to Section 2.00 of, by repealing Items 0509-401, 0515-497, 0540-101-3228, 0650-102-0001, 3540-001-3228, 3640-498, 3760-101-3228, 3980-008-0044, 4170-011-0289, 4300-490, 5225-011-0678, 6100-495, 7100-495, 7350-401, and 8570-102-3228 of Section 2.00 of, by amending Sections 4.05, 12.00, 13.40, 35.50, 39.00, 99.00, and 99.50 of, and by adding Section 15.80 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-26 - Assembly - SB 108 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB108 Wiener Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB108 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2024.
2024-06-29 Approved by the Governor.
2024-06-27 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2024-06-26SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-06-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-06-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2024-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-24AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2024-06-24AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2024-06-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2024-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-03-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 488.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-03-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2023-03-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.)
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback