CA SB107 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13823.95 of the Penal Code, relating to sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault: victim medical evidentiary examination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 107 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 Corbett (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2013.
2013-08-26 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
2013-08-12SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-08-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2483.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2013-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 22).
2013-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2013-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 467.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected January 22.)

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13823.95Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_107&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20130110_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20130430_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20130813_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20130826_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20130409_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20130422_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20130502_1020AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20130611_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20130703_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20130808_1051AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback