CA SB1062 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-13 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-13 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71092 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
California Community Colleges: board of governors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Assembly - SB 1062 Liu Senate Third Reading By GALGIANI (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1062 Liu (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1062 Liu (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-13 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-08-13 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. In Senate. Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-08-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-06-28 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 5525.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-04 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-05-21 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3552.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-05-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-02 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3230.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-03-13 | Set for hearing March 21. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-14 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70901.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 71092 | Amended Code | Citation Text |