CA SB1035 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 828, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 828, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5346 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health services: assisted outpatient treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1035 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Bloom (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1035 Eggman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1035 Eggman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 828, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5995.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3826.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 3). |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3349.) (April 6). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5346 | Amended Code | Citation Text |