CA SB1025 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 924, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 924, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1001.80 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to veteran diversion.
Title
Pretrial diversion for veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1025 Eggman Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1025 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Lackey (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1025 Eggman (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1025 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Lackey (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1025 Eggman (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 924, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6895.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4029.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3968.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3351.) (March 19). |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | March 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1001.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |