CA SB1021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Section 1342.71 of, and to add and repeal Sections 1342.72 and 1342.73 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend and repeal Section 10123.193 of, and to add and repeal Sections 10123.1931 and 10123.1932 of, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1021 Wiener et al (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4341.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4240.) (May 22).
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4851.) (April 25).
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
2018-02-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1342.71Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10123.193Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback