CA SB1021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 787, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 787, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 1342.71 of, and to add and repeal Sections 1342.72 and 1342.73 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend and repeal Section 10123.193 of, and to add and repeal Sections 10123.1931 and 10123.1932 of, the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1021 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1021 Wiener Senate Third Reading By GABRIEL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1021 Wiener et al (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1021 Wiener Senate Third Reading By GABRIEL (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1021 Wiener et al (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 787, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 5860.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6592.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4341.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4240.) (May 22). |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4851.) (April 25). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1342.71 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.193 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |