CA SB1017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8394.5, 8561, 8579, and 9028 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 8561.5 of, and to add Sections 8583 and 8583.5 to, the Fish and Game Code, and to add Section 35651 to the Public Resources Code, relating to fisheries, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Commercial fishing: drift gill net shark and swordfish fishery: permit transition program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1017 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1017 Allen Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1017 Allen et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1017 Allen Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1017 Allen et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 844, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 6052.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6778.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4390.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4787.) (April 24). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | March 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 7057 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8394.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8561 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8561.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8567 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8579 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8583 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 8583.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 9028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 35651 | New Code | See Bill Text |