CA AR23 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Introduced on August 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-06 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2946.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-06 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2946.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to youth.
Title
Relative to youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2946.). |
2013-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Introduced. |