CA ACR86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-16-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-16-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Juneteenth.
Title
Juneteenth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent ACR86 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-07-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.) |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2295.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |