CA ACR8 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-18)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Adopted and to Senate. (Page 159.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-15AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 159.)
2021-01-19SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-01-15AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-01-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 11).
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-01-09AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-01-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback