CA ACR68 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-23)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-23)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Public Service Recognition Week.
Title
Public Service Recognition Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR68 Davis By Cedillo (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-09-16 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-02 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-01 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 2062.) | |
2009-06-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2009-05-27 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-26 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1675.) | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2009-05-14 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-05-01 | From printer. | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced. To print. |